Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleRESTORE PUBLIC TRUST v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02941
Date Filed2019-10-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge John D. Bates
PlaintiffRESTORE PUBLIC TRUST
Case DescriptionRestore Public Trust submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Transportation for records concerning communications between the Secretary's Office and American Crossroads. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Restore Public Trust filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-10-011COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6409879) filed by RESTORE PUBLIC TRUST. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons as to USAO, # 4 Summons as to AG, # 5 Summons as to DOT)(Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 10/01/2019)
2019-10-012LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by RESTORE PUBLIC TRUST (Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 10/01/2019)
2019-10-02Case assigned to Judge John D. Bates. (zmc) (Entered: 10/02/2019)
2019-10-023SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 10/02/2019)
2019-10-094NOTICE of Appearance by Marsha Wellknown Yee on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 10/09/2019)
2019-10-215NOTICE of Appearance by Emma Lewis on behalf of RESTORE PUBLIC TRUST (Lewis, Emma) (Main Document 5 replaced on 10/22/2019) (ztd). (Main Document 5 replaced on 10/23/2019) (znmw). (Entered: 10/21/2019)
2019-10-286RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/4/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/3/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/15/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION served on 10/15/2019 (Lewis, Emma) (Entered: 10/28/2019)
2019-11-047ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION.(Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 11/04/2019)
2019-11-048ORDER directing parties to confer and to submit a proposed briefing schedule for the filing of dispositive motions or a proposed processing and production schedule by not later than December 18, 2019. See text of Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 11/4/2019. (lcjdb1) (Entered: 11/04/2019)
2019-11-04Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 12/18/2019. (tb) (Entered: 11/04/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar