Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICANS FOR PROSPERITY v. EXPORT-IMPORT BANK OF THE UNITED STATES et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02948
Date Filed2019-10-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffAMERICANS FOR PROSPERITY
Case DescriptionAmericans for Prosperity submitted FOIA requests to the Export-Import Bank and the Department of Treasury for records concerning the government's attempts to reduce government subsidized export financing. Americans for Prosperity also requested a fee waiver and inclusion in the media fee category. Both agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests. Both agencies told Americans for Prosperity that the request qualified for unusual circumstances and would take time to process. After hearing nothing further from either agency, Americans for Prosperity filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantEXPORT-IMPORT BANK OF THE UNITED STATES
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-10-011COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6410773) filed by AMERICANS FOR PROSPERITY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet, # 7 Summons Ex-Im, # 8 Summons Treasury, # 9 Summons U.S. Att'y Gen., # 10 Summons USAO Civil Process Clerk)(Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 10/01/2019)
2019-10-012LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICANS FOR PROSPERITY (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 10/01/2019)
2019-10-01Case assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zmc) (Entered: 10/01/2019)
2019-10-013SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to EXPORT-IMPORT BANK OF THE UNITED STATES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 10/01/2019)
2019-10-034RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/2/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/1/2019. (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 10/03/2019)
2019-10-035RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/03/2019. (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 10/03/2019)
2019-10-036RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY served on 10/3/2019 (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 10/03/2019)
2019-10-107RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. EXPORT-IMPORT BANK OF THE UNITED STATES served on 10/3/2019 (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 10/10/2019)
2019-11-018NOTICE of Change of Address by Ryan Patrick Mulvey (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 11/01/2019)
2019-11-019NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Patrick Schaefer on behalf of All Defendants (Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 11/01/2019)
2019-11-0110ANSWER to Complaint by EXPORT-IMPORT BANK OF THE UNITED STATES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY.(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 11/01/2019)
2019-11-04MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and file a joint proposed schedule for disclosure or briefing by December 2, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 11/4/19. (lctjk2) (Entered: 11/04/2019)
2019-11-04Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint proposed schedule for disclosure or briefing due by 12/2/2019. (zkh) (Entered: 11/04/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar