Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNOVA OCULUS PARTNERS, LLC, f/k/a THE EYE MACHINE, LLC et al v. U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02950
Date Filed2019-10-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffNOVA OCULUS PARTNERS, LLC
formerly known as EYE MACHINE, LLC
PlaintiffPETER POCKLINGTON
PlaintiffLANTSON E. ELDRED
PlaintiffAMC HOLDINGS CO., LLC
Case DescriptionNova Oculus Partners submitted a FOIA request to the FDA for records concerning emails sent by a number of agency employees referring to Nova Oculus or its partners or related entities. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Nova Oculus filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-10-011COMPLAINT against U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6411487) filed by NOVA OCULUS PARTNERS, LLC, f/k/a THE EYE MACHINE, LLC, AMC HOLDINGS CO., LLC, LANTSON E. ELDRED, PETER POCKLINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Exhibit 1, # 6 Exhibit 2, # 7 Exhibit 3, # 8 Exhibit 4, # 9 Exhibit 5)(Himes, Lisa) (Entered: 10/01/2019)
2019-10-012ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by AMC HOLDINGS CO., LLC, LANTSON E. ELDRED, NOVA OCULUS PARTNERS, LLC, f/k/a THE EYE MACHINE, LLC, PETER POCKLINGTON. Case related to Case No. 19-666. (Himes, Lisa) Modified on 10/3/2019 (zrdj). (Entered: 10/01/2019)
2019-10-013NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by AMC HOLDINGS CO., LLC, LANTSON E. ELDRED, NOVA OCULUS PARTNERS, LLC, f/k/a THE EYE MACHINE, LLC, PETER POCKLINGTON. Case related to Case No. 19-2700. and 19-666 (Himes, Lisa) Modified on 10/3/2019 (zrdj). (Entered: 10/01/2019)
2019-10-03NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 2 Notice of Related Case was entered as a duplicate to docket entry 3 Notice of Related Case. (zrdj) (Entered: 10/03/2019)
2019-10-03Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zrdj) (Entered: 10/03/2019)
2019-10-034LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMC Holdings Co., LLC and by NOVA OCULUS PARTNERS, LLC (Himes, Lisa) (Entered: 10/03/2019)
2019-10-035SUMMONS (3) Issued as to U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj) (Entered: 10/03/2019)
2019-10-146RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/8/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/7/2019. (Himes, Lisa) (Entered: 10/14/2019)
2019-10-147RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/8/2019. (Himes, Lisa) (Entered: 10/14/2019)
2019-10-148RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION served on 10/9/2019 (Himes, Lisa) (Entered: 10/14/2019)
2019-10-159NOTICE of Appearance by Damon William Taaffe on behalf of U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
2019-11-0610ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION.(Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 11/06/2019)
2019-11-06MINUTE ORDER requiring the parties to MEET AND CONFER and file a joint status report proposing a schedule for further proceedings. The status report should address the status of the plaintiff's FOIA request, including the anticipated number of documents responsive to the request and the anticipated date(s) for release of the requested documents. The parties shall file the joint status report on or before November 20, 2019. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on November 6, 2019. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 11/06/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar