Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2019-10-02 | 1 | COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6412562) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Department of the Treasury)(Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 10/02/2019) |
2019-10-02 | 2 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 10/02/2019) |
2019-10-07 | | Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zed, ) (Entered: 10/07/2019) |
2019-10-07 | 3 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zed, ) (Entered: 10/07/2019) |
2019-10-08 | 4 | STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on October 8, 2019. (lcbah2) (Entered: 10/08/2019) |
2019-10-17 | 5 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/16/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/15/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/16/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY served on 10/16/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 10/17/2019) |
2019-11-15 | 6 | ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY.(Luh, James) (Entered: 11/15/2019) |
2019-11-15 | | Minute Order (paperless) DIRECTING the plaintiff to show cause, by November 22, 2019, why this case should not be consolidated with 19-cv-2960 pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42; and further DIRECTING defendant to file, by November 26, 2019, any reply to the plaintiff's response. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on November 15, 2019. (lcbah2) (Entered: 11/15/2019) |
2019-11-18 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's response to Show Cause due by 11/22/2019; defendant's reply, if any, due by 11/26/2019. (tg) (Entered: 11/18/2019) |
2019-11-25 | 7 | Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Luh, James) (Entered: 11/25/2019) |
2019-11-25 | 8 | REPLY re Order, Order, (Defendants' Reply in Response to November 15, 2019, Orders of the Court) filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Luh, James) (Entered: 11/25/2019) |
2019-11-25 | | MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING 7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Join Status Report and DIRECTING the parties to file, by December 3, 2019, a Joint Status Report in accordance with paragraph 3 of the 4 Standing Order. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on November 25, 2019. (lcbah2) (Entered: 11/25/2019) |
2019-11-25 | | Minute Order (paperless) CONSOLIDATING, upon consideration of 8 Defendants' Reply in Response to November 15, 2019 Orders of the Court, this case, Civil Case No. 19-2961, with Judicial Watch, Inc. v. U.S. Dept of State , Civil Case No. 19-2960, for all purposes. See Local Rule 40.5; Fed. R. Civ. P. 42. The parties are directed that all filings in these consolidated cases shall be made only in Case No. 19-2960. The Clerk shall close this case and transfer whatever parties are not identical to Case No. 19-2960. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on November 25, 2019. (lcbah2) (Entered: 11/25/2019) |
2019-11-25 | | CASE CONSOLIDATED. Case 19-2961 has been consolidated with 19-2961 pursuant to a MINUTE ORDER entered 11/25/2019. From this date forward all pleadings shall be filed ONLY in Civil Action No. 19-2960. The parties are advised NOT to elect to SPREAD text when filing in ECF, as this will result in repetitive docketing and emails (zrdj) (Entered: 11/26/2019) |
Hide Docket Events |