Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2019-10-03 | 1 | COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against UNITED STATES OFFICE OF SURFACE MINING RECLAMATION AND ENFORCEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6415714) filed by MONTANA ENVIRONMENTAL INFORMATION CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Office of Surface Mining and Enforcement, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney District of DC, # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney General)(Mellgren, John) (Entered: 10/03/2019) |
2019-10-03 | 2 | MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Shiloh S. Hernandez, :Firm- Western Environmental Law Center, :Address- 103 Reeder's Alley, Helena, Montana 59601. Phone No. - 406-204-4861. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6415798. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by MONTANA ENVIRONMENTAL INFORMATION CENTER (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Mellgren, John) (Entered: 10/03/2019) |
2019-10-03 | 3 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by MONTANA ENVIRONMENTAL INFORMATION CENTER (Mellgren, John) (Entered: 10/03/2019) |
2019-10-08 | | Case assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zmc) (Entered: 10/08/2019) |
2019-10-08 | 4 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES OFFICE OF SURFACE MINING RECLAMATION AND ENFORCEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zmc) (Entered: 10/08/2019) |
2019-10-08 | 5 | STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 10/8/2019. (lctnm3) (Entered: 10/08/2019) |
2019-10-08 | | MINUTE ORDER granting the 2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Counsel Shiloh S. Hernandez shall promptly register for this Court's CM/ECF system. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 10/8/2019. (lctnm3) (Entered: 10/08/2019) |
2019-10-09 | 6 | NOTICE of Appearance by Shiloh Silvan Hernandez on behalf of MONTANA ENVIRONMENTAL INFORMATION CENTER (Hernandez, Shiloh) (Entered: 10/09/2019) |
2019-10-25 | 7 | NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Cirino on behalf of UNITED STATES OFFICE OF SURFACE MINING RECLAMATION AND ENFORCEMENT (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 10/25/2019) |
2019-11-05 | 8 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/17/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/16/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Mailing, # 2 Exhibit - Certified Mail Receipts)(Hernandez, Shiloh) (Entered: 11/05/2019) |
2019-11-05 | 9 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/15/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Mailing, # 2 Exhibit - Certified Mail Receipts)(Hernandez, Shiloh) (Entered: 11/05/2019) |
2019-11-05 | 10 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES OFFICE OF SURFACE MINING RECLAMATION AND ENFORCEMENT served on 10/15/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Mailing, # 2 Exhibit - Certified Mail Receipts)(Hernandez, Shiloh) (Entered: 11/05/2019) |
2019-11-18 | 11 | ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES OFFICE OF SURFACE MINING RECLAMATION AND ENFORCEMENT.(Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 11/18/2019) |
2019-11-18 | | MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court are a complaint and an answer in this FOIA case. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report proposing a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule should address, among other things, the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, and a briefing schedule for dispositive motions, if required. The parties shall file the report on or before December 18, 2019. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 11/18/2019. (lctnm3) (Entered: 11/18/2019) |
2019-11-19 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/18/2019. (hmc) (Entered: 11/19/2019) |
2019-12-18 | 12 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES OFFICE OF SURFACE MINING RECLAMATION AND ENFORCEMENT. (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 12/18/2019) |
2019-12-19 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 12 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another Report on or before February 21, 2020, which shall update the Court regarding the status of the Defendant's productions and withholdings, and propose a further schedule for proceeding. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 12/19/2019. (lctnm3) (Entered: 12/19/2019) |
2019-12-19 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/21/2020. (hmc) (Entered: 12/19/2019) |
2020-02-20 | 13 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES OFFICE OF SURFACE MINING RECLAMATION AND ENFORCEMENT. (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 02/20/2020) |
2020-02-21 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 13 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another Joint Status Report no later than March 23, 2020. The report shall include the Plaintiff's position regarding the Defendant's withholdings and a proposed schedule for further proceedings, if necessary. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 2/21/2020. (lctnm3) (Entered: 02/21/2020) |
2020-02-21 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint status report due by 3/23/2020. (tg) (Entered: 02/21/2020) |
2020-03-23 | 14 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES OFFICE OF SURFACE MINING RECLAMATION AND ENFORCEMENT. (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 03/23/2020) |
2020-03-25 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 14 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another Joint Status Report by May 22, 2020. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall promptly inform the Court of a sooner agreement to dismiss this matter. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 3/25/2020. (lctnm3) (Entered: 03/25/2020) |
2020-03-25 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/22/2020. (hmc) (Entered: 03/25/2020) |
2020-05-22 | 15 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES OFFICE OF SURFACE MINING RECLAMATION AND ENFORCEMENT. (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 05/22/2020) |
2020-05-22 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 15 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another Joint Status Report by June 22, 2020. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall promptly inform the Court of a sooner agreement to dismiss this matter. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 5/22/2020. (lctnm3) (Entered: 05/22/2020) |
2020-05-22 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/22/2020. (hmc) (Entered: 05/22/2020) |
2020-06-05 | 16 | STIPULATION of Dismissal by UNITED STATES OFFICE OF SURFACE MINING RECLAMATION AND ENFORCEMENT. (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 06/05/2020) |
2020-06-05 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 16 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal, this matter is DISMISSED with prejudice in accordance with the terms of the stipulation. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). The Clerk of the Court is directed to close the case. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 6/5/2020. (lctnm3) (Entered: 06/05/2020) |
Hide Docket Events |