Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGWICH'IN STEERING COMMITTEE et al v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02978
Date Filed2019-10-03
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Carl J. Nichols
PlaintiffGWICH'IN STEERING COMMITTEE
PlaintiffALASKA WILDERNESS LEAGUE
PlaintiffDEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE
PlaintiffWILDERNESS SOCIETY
Case DescriptionGwich'in Steering Committee, Alaska Wilderness League, Defenders of Wildlife, and the Wilderness Society submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Interior for records concerning the agency's decision to allow drilling in the Arctic Wilderness Refuge. The agency acknowledged the requests but after hearing nothing further pertaining to any of the requests, the plaintiffs filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
John A. Fonstad
222 West 7th Avenue, RM 253 #9
Anchorage, AK 99513
9072714274
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
DefendantU.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
DefendantU.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-07-311COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2736070.), filed by All Plaintiffs.(Jenson, Maresa) [Transferred from Alaska on 10/3/2019.] (Entered: 07/31/2019)
2019-07-312Civil Cover Sheet. (Jenson, Maresa) [Transferred from Alaska on 10/3/2019.] (Entered: 07/31/2019)
2019-07-313Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alaska Wilderness League. (Jenson, Maresa) [Transferred from Alaska on 10/3/2019.] (Entered: 07/31/2019)
2019-07-314Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defenders of Wildlife. (Jenson, Maresa) [Transferred from Alaska on 10/3/2019.] (Entered: 07/31/2019)
2019-07-315Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gwich'in Steering Committee. (Jenson, Maresa) [Transferred from Alaska on 10/3/2019.] (Entered: 07/31/2019)
2019-07-316Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Wilderness Society. (Jenson, Maresa) [Transferred from Alaska on 10/3/2019.] (Entered: 07/31/2019)
2019-07-317MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney David A. Bahr. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2736174.) by Alaska Wilderness League, Defenders of Wildlife, Gwich'in Steering Committee, The Wilderness Society. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Jenson, Maresa) [Transferred from Alaska on 10/3/2019.] (Entered: 07/31/2019)
2019-07-318Unissued summons re Defendant U.S. Department of the Interior, (Attachments: # 1 Unissued Summons re Defendant U.S. Bureau of Land Management, # 2 Unissued Summons re Defendant U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service)(PXS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from Alaska on 10/3/2019.] (Entered: 07/31/2019)
2019-07-31Summons Issued as to U.S. Bureau of Land Management, U.S. Department of the Interior, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service.(PXS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from Alaska on 10/3/2019.] (Entered: 07/31/2019)
2019-07-319Amended Civil Cover Sheet. (Jenson, Maresa) Modified on 8/1/2019 to clarify docket text (JLH, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from Alaska on 10/3/2019.] (Entered: 07/31/2019)
2019-08-0110CLERK'S NOTICE re 7 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David A. Bahr, at docket 7 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (JLH, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from Alaska on 10/3/2019.] (Entered: 08/01/2019)
2019-08-1411SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alaska Wilderness League, Gwich'in Steering Committee, Defenders of Wildlife, The Wilderness Society. U.S. Bureau of Land Management served on 7/31/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (Jenson, Maresa) [Transferred from Alaska on 10/3/2019.] (Entered: 08/14/2019)
2019-08-1412SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alaska Wilderness League, Gwich'in Steering Committee, Defenders of Wildlife, The Wilderness Society. U.S. Department of the Interior served on 7/31/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (Jenson, Maresa) [Transferred from Alaska on 10/3/2019.] (Entered: 08/14/2019)
2019-08-1413SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alaska Wilderness League, Gwich'in Steering Committee, Defenders of Wildlife, The Wilderness Society. U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service served on 7/31/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (Jenson, Maresa) [Transferred from Alaska on 10/3/2019.] (Entered: 08/14/2019)
2019-09-1614MOTION to Transfer and to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by U.S. Bureau of Land Management, U.S. Department of the Interior, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Complaint, # 2 Exhibit B - District of Columbia Live Database, # 3 Exhibit C - LexisNexis CourtLink Search, # 4 Proposed Order)(Fonstad, John) [Transferred from Alaska on 10/3/2019.] (Entered: 09/16/2019)
2019-09-2115MOTION to Expedite (Unopposed) Consideration of Motion to Transfer and to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Alaska Wilderness League, Defenders of Wildlife, Gwich'in Steering Committee, The Wilderness Society. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Brown, Valerie) [Transferred from Alaska on 10/3/2019.] (Entered: 09/21/2019)
2019-09-2116DECLARATION of Maresa Jenson re 15 MOTION to Expedite (Unopposed) Consideration of Motion to Transfer and to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Alaska Wilderness League, Defenders of Wildlife, Gwich'in Steering Committee, The Wilderness Society. (Brown, Valerie) [Transferred from Alaska on 10/3/2019.] (Entered: 09/21/2019)
2019-09-2117RESPONSE in Opposition re 14 MOTION to Transfer and to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by Alaska Wilderness League, Defenders of Wildlife, Gwich'in Steering Committee, The Wilderness Society. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order)(Brown, Valerie) [Transferred from Alaska on 10/3/2019.] (Entered: 09/21/2019)
2019-09-2118DECLARATION of Maresa Jenson re 17 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Alaska Wilderness League, Defenders of Wildlife, Gwich'in Steering Committee, The Wilderness Society. (Brown, Valerie) [Transferred from Alaska on 10/3/2019.] (Entered: 09/21/2019)
2019-09-2419RESPONSE in Opposition re 15 MOTION to Expedite (Unopposed) Consideration of Motion to Transfer and to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond (Partial) filed by U.S. Bureau of Land Management, U.S. Department of the Interior, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service. (Fonstad, John) [Transferred from Alaska on 10/3/2019.] (Entered: 09/24/2019)
2019-09-2420ORDER granting 15 Motion to Expedite Consideration re 14 Motion to Transfer and to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Response. Reply due 9/27/19. Defendants to notify the court by 9/25/19 if no intention to file a reply. (JLH, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from Alaska on 10/3/2019.] (Entered: 09/24/2019)
2019-09-2721REPLY to Response to Motion re 14 MOTION to Transfer and to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by U.S. Bureau of Land Management, U.S. Department of the Interior, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- Dkt 14, # 2 Exhibit B- Dkt 15)(Fonstad, John) [Transferred from Alaska on 10/3/2019.] (Entered: 09/27/2019)
2019-09-3022ORDER granting 14 Motion to Transfer. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 9/30/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from Alaska on 10/3/2019.] (Entered: 09/30/2019)
2019-10-0323Case transferred in from District of Alaska; Case Number 3:19-cv-00208. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 10/03/2019)
2019-10-0824MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Maresa Jenson, :Firm- Trustees for Alaska, :Address- 1026 W. 4th Ave., Suite 201, Anchorage, AK 99501. Phone No. - (907) 308-8678. Fax No. - N/A Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6430004. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ALASKA WILDERNESS LEAGUE, DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE, GWICH'IN STEERING COMMITTEE, WILDERNESS SOCIETY (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Maresa Jenson in Support of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to allow Maresa Jensonto Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Bahr, David) (Entered: 10/08/2019)
2019-10-0825MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Valerie Brown, :Firm- Trustees for Alaska, :Address- 1026 W. 4th Ave., Suite 201, Anchorage, AK 99501. Phone No. - (907) 308-5797. Fax No. - N/A Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6430065. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ALASKA WILDERNESS LEAGUE, DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE, GWICH'IN STEERING COMMITTEE, WILDERNESS SOCIETY (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Valerie Brown in Support of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to allow Valerie Brown to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Bahr, David) (Entered: 10/08/2019)
2019-11-0826RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/16/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/15/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Maresa Jenson, # 2 Exhibit A)(Bahr, David) (Entered: 11/08/2019)
2019-11-1327NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Patrick Schaefer on behalf of All Defendants (Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 11/13/2019)
2019-11-1328Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1: Answer to the Complaint, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 11/13/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar