Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMISCHLER v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02937
Date Filed2019-10-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffAMY MISCHLER
Case DescriptionAmy Mischler filed suit alleging that the Commonwealth of Kentucky had improperly identified her as a child abuser. As part of her attempt to remove that information, she filed a FOIA request with the FBI. She also asked for expedited processing. The FBI acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Mischler filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantWILLIAM P. BARR Attorney General
DefendantWILLIAM BARR Attorney General
DefendantLEEANN VEATCH Administrative Assistant to Kentucky Governor Matt Bevin
DefendantKELLY KNIGHT CRAFT Ambassador
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-10-011COMPLAINT against WILLIAM BARR, KELLY KNIGHT CRAFT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, LEEANN VEATCH filed by AMY MISCHLER. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ztd) (Entered: 10/04/2019)
2019-10-012NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by AMY MISCHLER. Case related to Case No. 19-2493. (ztd) (Entered: 10/04/2019)
2019-10-07Summons (3) Issued as to WILLIAM BARR, KELLY KNIGHT CRAFT, LEEANN VEATCH. (zrdj) (Entered: 10/07/2019)
2019-10-103RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. WILLIAM BARR served on 10/07/2019; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 10/08/2019, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 9/30/19. (ztd) Modified dates served on 10/23/2019 (ztd). (Entered: 10/15/2019)
2019-10-304ORDER: Advising pro se Plaintiff of her obligation to follow the FRCP, Local Rules and orders of the court. Failure to adhere to these rules or orders may result in sanctions, up to and including dismissal of this action. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order: AMY MISCHLER, 1120 Palm Court, Okeechobee, FL 34974. (See order for further details). Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/30/19. (DJS) (Entered: 10/30/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar