Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleColeman v. United States Drug Enforcement Administration
DistrictEastern District of Virginia
CityAlexandria
Case Number1:2019cv01263
Date Filed2019-10-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeDistrict Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr
PlaintiffJohn J. Coleman
Case DescriptionJohn Coleman, who operates Drug Watch International, a non-profit organization that serves as a watchdog over the DEA, submitted a FOIA request to the DEA for records concerning communications to or from former acting administrator Chuck Rosenberg and 13 individuals who had worked with the Justice Department or the intelligence community. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Coleman filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Recovery of Costs

DefendantUnited States Drug Enforcement Administration
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-10-011COMPLAINT against United States Drug Enforcement Administration ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 14683080997.), filed by John J. Coleman. (Attachments: # 1 Receipt)(dvanm, ) (Entered: 10/01/2019)
2019-10-012Summons Issued, certified mail, as to United States Drug Enforcement Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (dvanm, ) (Entered: 10/01/2019)
2019-10-013MOTION for Pro Se E-Noticing by John J. Coleman. (dvanm, ) (Entered: 10/01/2019)
2019-10-01Case Reassigned to District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr. District Judge T. S. Ellis, III no longer assigned to the case. (aott, ) (Entered: 10/01/2019)
2019-10-014ORDER granting 3 Motion for Pro Se E-Noticing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 10/01/2019. (dvanm, ) (Entered: 10/02/2019)
2019-10-225SUMMONS Returned Executed. US Attorney's Office served on 10/2/2019, answer due 12/2/2019. (dvanm, ) (Entered: 10/22/2019)
2019-10-286Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by United States Drug Enforcement Administration. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(McCotter, R.) (Entered: 10/28/2019)
2019-10-297ORDER granting 6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. ORDERED that Defendant's time to respond to the Complaint is extended to December 6, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 10/29/19. (cmar, ) (Entered: 10/29/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar