Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNational Lawyers Guild San Francisco Bay Area Chapter v. Department of Homeland Security et al
DistrictNorthern District of California
CityOakland
Case Number4:2019cv06471
Date Filed2019-10-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu
PlaintiffNational Lawyers Guild San Francisco Bay Area Chapter
Case DescriptionThe National Lawyers Guild, San Francisco Chapter, submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning Jerome Aba, an individual from the Philippines who had been detained by U.S. Customs and Border Protection when he arrived at San Francisco International Airport. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests. DHS provided some records with redactions under Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy), Exemption 7(C) (invasion of privacy concerning law enforcement records), and Exemption 7(E) (investigative methods or techniques). The National Lawyers Guild filed an administrative appeal but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the National Lawyers Guild filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDepartment of Homeland Security
DefendantDepartment of Homeland Security Office of Customs and Border Protection
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-10-091COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13776759.). Filed byNational Lawyers Guild San Francisco Bay Area Chapter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A-J to Complaint, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Cisneros, Abenicio) (Filed on 10/9/2019) (Entered: 10/09/2019)
2019-10-092Proposed Summons. (Cisneros, Abenicio) (Filed on 10/9/2019) (Entered: 10/09/2019)
2019-10-093Proposed Summons. (Cisneros, Abenicio) (Filed on 10/9/2019) (Entered: 10/09/2019)
2019-10-094Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/23/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2019) (Entered: 10/09/2019)
2019-10-105Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/1/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/8/2020 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2019) (Entered: 10/10/2019)
2019-10-106Summons Issued as to Department of Homeland Security, Department of Homeland Security Office of Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2019) (Entered: 10/10/2019)
2019-10-257CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 11/8/2019. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2019) (Entered: 10/25/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar