Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSIERRA CLUB v. UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv03018
Date Filed2019-10-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffSIERRA CLUB
Case DescriptionThe Sierra Club submitted a FOIA request to the EPA for records concerning administrator Andrew Wheeler's assertion that the effects of climate change would not occur for another 50 to 75 years. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency ultimately told the Sierra Club that its request was too vague to allow for a search. The Sierra Club filed an administrative appeal but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Sierra Club filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-10-091COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6434621) filed by SIERRA CLUB. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons)(Miller, Matthew) (Entered: 10/09/2019)
2019-10-092LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by SIERRA CLUB (Miller, Matthew) (Entered: 10/09/2019)
2019-10-113ERRATA correcting Civil Cover Sheet by SIERRA CLUB 1 Complaint, filed by SIERRA CLUB. (Miller, Matthew) (Entered: 10/11/2019)
2019-10-15Case assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zmc) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
2019-10-154SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
2019-10-295RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. SIERRA CLUB served on 10/23/2019 (Miller, Matthew) (Entered: 10/29/2019)
2019-10-296RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/24/2019. (Miller, Matthew) (Entered: 10/29/2019)
2019-10-297RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/29/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/28/2019. (Miller, Matthew) (Entered: 10/29/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar