Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMONTANA ENVIRONMENTAL INFORMATION CENTER et al v. UNITED STATES OFFICE OF SURFACE MINING RECLAMATION AND ENFORCEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv03019
Date Filed2019-10-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffMONTANA ENVIRONMENTAL INFORMATION CENTER
PlaintiffSIERRA CLUB
Case DescriptionMinnesota Environmental Information Center and the Sierra Club submitted FOIA requests to U.S. Office of Surface Mining Reclamation and Enforcement for records concerning communications between the agency and U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service pertaining to the Amendment 3 expansion of the Bull Mountains Mine 10. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Minnesota Environmental Information Center filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES OFFICE OF SURFACE MINING RECLAMATION AND ENFORCEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-10-091COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against UNITED STATES OFFICE OF SURFACE MINING RECLAMATION AND ENFORCEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6436262) filed by MONTANA ENVIRONMENTAL INFORMATION CENTER, SIERRA CLUB. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Office of Surface Mining Reclamation and Enforcement, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney District of DC, # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney General)(Mellgren, John) (Entered: 10/09/2019)
2019-10-092MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Shiloh S. Hernandez, :Firm- Western Environmental Law Center, :Address- 103 Reeder's Alley, Helena, Montana 59601. Phone No. - 406-204-4861. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6436341. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by MONTANA ENVIRONMENTAL INFORMATION CENTER, SIERRA CLUB (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Mellgren, John) (Entered: 10/09/2019)
2019-10-093LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by MONTANA ENVIRONMENTAL INFORMATION CENTER (Mellgren, John) (Entered: 10/09/2019)
2019-10-094LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by SIERRA CLUB (Mellgren, John) (Entered: 10/09/2019)
2019-10-095ERRATA by MONTANA ENVIRONMENTAL INFORMATION CENTER, SIERRA CLUB 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Shiloh S. Hernandez, :Firm- Western Environmental Law Center, :Address- 103 Reeder's Alley, Helena, Montana 59601. Phone No. - 406-204-4861. Filing fee $ 100, receipt n filed by SIERRA CLUB, MONTANA ENVIRONMENTAL INFORMATION CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Mellgren, John) (Entered: 10/09/2019)
2019-10-11Case assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zmc) (Entered: 10/11/2019)
2019-10-116SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES OFFICE OF SURFACE MINING RECLAMATION AND ENFORCEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 10/11/2019)
2019-10-22MINUTE ORDER GRANTING 2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of John R. Mellgren. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 10/22/2019. (lcjeb2) Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Click for instructions (Entered: 10/22/2019)
2019-10-307NOTICE of Appearance by Shiloh Silvan Hernandez on behalf of MONTANA ENVIRONMENTAL INFORMATION CENTER, SIERRA CLUB (Hernandez, Shiloh) (Entered: 10/30/2019)
2019-11-018RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/24/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/23/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Mailing, # 2 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipts)(Mellgren, John) (Entered: 11/01/2019)
2019-11-019RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/24/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Mailing, # 2 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipts)(Mellgren, John) (Entered: 11/01/2019)
2019-11-0110RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES OFFICE OF SURFACE MINING RECLAMATION AND ENFORCEMENT served on 10/24/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Mailing, # 2 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipts)(Mellgren, John) (Entered: 11/01/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar