Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleRCM Solutions, Inc et al v. General Services Administration
DistrictDistrict of Maryland
CityGreenbelt
Case Number8:2019cv02952
Date Filed2019-10-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Charles B. Day
PlaintiffRCM Solutions Inc.
PlaintiffRonald C. Martin
Case DescriptionRonald Martin and his company RCM Solutions submitted a FOIA request to the General Services Administration for records concerning the IP address associated with negative comments made on a GSA website designed to provide feedback about the agency's performance. Martin assured the agency that his company did not make the comments. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but denied them on the basis of Exemption 5 (privileges) and Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy). RCM Solutions filed an administrative appeal of the denial. The agency upheld its original decision. RCM Solutions then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantGeneral Services Administration
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-10-091COMPLAINT against General Services Administration ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8283111.), filed by RCM Solutions, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment, # 2 Attachment, # 3 Attachment, # 4 Attachment, # 5 Attachment, # 6 Attachment, # 7 Civil Cover Sheet, # 8 Summons)(Romberger, Timothy) (Entered: 10/09/2019)
2019-10-092Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by RCM Solutions, Inc (Romberger, Timothy) (Entered: 10/09/2019)
2019-10-093Summons Issued 60 days as to General Services Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(dg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/09/2019)
2019-10-094NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day. Ronald C. Martin, RCM Solutions Inc. or counsel for Ronald C. Martin, RCM Solutions Inc. are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded here . Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded here , counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded here . To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 10/23/2019. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/09/2019)
2019-10-095Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 10/9/2019. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/09/2019)
2019-10-246ORDER directing Ronald C. Martin and RCM Solutions Inc. or counsel for Ronald C. Martin and RCM Solutions Inc. to show cause for failure to comply with Standing Order 2018-04 . Show Cause Hearing set for 11/22/2019 02:00 PM in (proceed to the Clerk's Office to determine the location of the hearing) before the Chambers Judge. This Order shall be vacated if Ronald C. Martin and RCM Solutions Inc. or counsel for Ronald C. Martin and RCM Solutions Inc files a consent or declination prior to the show cause hearing date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 10/24/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/24/2019)
2019-10-247(FILED IN ERROR - WRONG CASE)SCHEDULING ORDER(jf3s, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 10/24/2019 (jf3s, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 10/24/2019)
2019-10-259PAPERLESS ORDER CANCELLING Show Cause Hearing re: 6 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 10/25/2019. (ybs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/25/2019)
2019-10-2810NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re: 8 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. RCM Solutions, Inc and Ronald C. Martin or Counsel for RCM Solutions, Inc and Ronald C. Martin must correct the following error(s): **Incorrect form used - complete the form Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded here and refile using the event 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge located in Other Documents >25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/28/2019)
2019-10-2812SUMMONS Returned Executed by RCM Solutions Inc.. General Services Administration served on 10/11/2019, answer due 11/1/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons)(Romberger, Timothy) (Entered: 10/28/2019)
2019-11-0413NOTICE of Appearance by Jane Elizabeth Andersen on behalf of All Defendants (Andersen, Jane) (Entered: 11/04/2019)
2019-11-0614NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day. General Services Administration or counsel for General Services Administration are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded here . Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded here , counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded here . To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 11/20/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/06/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar