Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSNYDER v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv03045
Date Filed2019-10-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Royce C. Lamberth
PlaintiffBRAD SNYDER
Case DescriptionBrad Snyder, a legal historian writing a biography of Supreme Court Justice Felix Frankfurter, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning David Niles and Max Lowenthal, proteges of Frankfurter. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Snyder filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-10-111COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6443107) filed by BRAD SNYDER. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Fried, Rachel) (Entered: 10/11/2019)
2019-10-15Case assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (zmc) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
2019-10-152SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
2019-11-063RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/16/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/15/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proof of service on US Attorney)(Fried, Rachel) (Entered: 11/06/2019)
2019-11-064RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/21/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proof of service on Attorney General)(Fried, Rachel) (Entered: 11/06/2019)
2019-11-065RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 10/22/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proof of service on U.S. Dep't of State)(Fried, Rachel) (Entered: 11/06/2019)
2019-11-066NOTICE of Appearance by David C. Vladeck on behalf of BRAD SNYDER (Vladeck, David) (Entered: 11/06/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar