Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThe Protect Democracy Project, Inc. v. U.S. Department of State
DistrictDistrict of Massachusetts
CityBoston
Case Number1:2019cv12115
Date Filed2019-10-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Douglas P. Woodlock
PlaintiffThe Protect Democracy Project, Inc.
Case DescriptionThe Protect Democracy Project submitted two FOIA requests to the Department of State for records concerning communications between Rudy Giuliani and members of the U.S. Embassy in Ukraine. PDP also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, PDP filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Expedited processing, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Department of State
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-10-111COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of State Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7921073 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by The Protect Democracy Project, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Category Form)(Berwick, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/11/2019)
2019-10-112ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Douglas P. Woodlock assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 10/11/2019)
2019-10-113Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of State. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Pacho, Arnold) (Entered: 10/11/2019)
2019-10-284SUMMONS Returned Executed U.S. Department of State served on 10/21/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (Berwick, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/28/2019)
2019-10-285SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Attorney by The Protect Democracy Project, Inc.. U.S. Department of State served on 10/17/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (Berwick, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/28/2019)
2019-10-286SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Protect Democracy Project, Inc.. (Berwick, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/28/2019)
2019-10-317MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Jessica A. Marsden Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7948961 by The Protect Democracy Project, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Berwick, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/31/2019)
2019-10-318Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Jessica A. Marsden. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (McDonagh, Christina) (Entered: 10/31/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar