Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv03058
Date Filed2019-10-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted three FOIA requests to the Department of State for records concerning U.S. Special Representative to Ukraine Kurt Volker. American Oversight also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Expedited processing, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-10-121COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6445337) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 10/12/2019)
2019-10-152LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
2019-10-16Case assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zmc) (Entered: 10/16/2019)
2019-10-163SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 10/16/2019)
2019-10-244NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Charles Abbuhl on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Abbuhl, Joshua) (Entered: 10/24/2019)
2019-10-245NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. Case related to Case No. 19-02934. (Abbuhl, Joshua) (Entered: 10/24/2019)
2019-10-256RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/16/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/15/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/21/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 10/21/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 10/25/2019)
2019-10-28MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff shall inform the Court of its position as to whether the case is related to American Oversight v. U.S. Dep't of State, 19-cv-2934, currently before Judge Cooper, by October 31, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/28/2019. (lcabj3) (Entered: 10/28/2019)
2019-10-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff shall inform the Court of its position as to whether the case is related to American Oversight v. U.S. Dep't of State, 19-cv-2934, currently before Judge Cooper, by 10/31/2019. (jth) (Entered: 10/30/2019)
2019-10-307NOTICE regarding Plaintiff's position on relation to case 19-cv-2934 by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT re 5 Notice of Related Case (McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 10/30/2019)
2019-10-318Case directly reassigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper as related. Judge Amy Berman Jackson is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) (Entered: 11/01/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar