Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAmberg v. Homeland Security, U.S. Dept. of
DistrictEastern District of Michigan
CityDetroit
Case Number2:2019cv12994
Date Filed2019-10-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeDistrict Judge Mark A. Goldsmith
PlaintiffJames W Amberg
Case DescriptionJames Amberg submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records concerning communications between an ICE special agent and the news media pertaining to the 2016 Victory Inn sex trafficking case. ICE acknowledged receipt of the request but told Amberg that it would not process the request without a third-party authorization from the ICE agent. Amberg told the agency he did not believe the ICE agent had any privacy rights under the circumstances. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Amberg filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantHomeland Security, U.S. Dept. of
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-10-111Complaint filed by James W Amberg , Receipt No: 0645-7440619 - Fee: 47 dollars. (Amberg, James) (Entered: 10/11/2019)
2019-10-112ADDENDUM re 1 Miscellaneous Case Initiation - Other by James W Amberg (Amberg, James) (Entered: 10/11/2019)
2019-10-113Ex Parte MOTION to Waive Fees by James W Amberg. (Amberg, James) (Entered: 10/11/2019)
2019-10-174ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford to District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith and Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (NAhm) (Entered: 10/17/2019)
2019-11-065ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Waive Filing Fees (Dkt. 3 ). Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) (Entered: 11/06/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar