Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSPARACINO PLLC v. UNITED STATES AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv03065
Date Filed2019-10-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffSPARACINO PLLC
Case DescriptionSparacino PLLC, a law firm representing individuals and families of individuals who had been killed or injured by terrorist attacks in Iraq, submitted three FOIA requests to U.S. Agency for International Development. Two of the requests identified specific records while the third request asked for records about corruption at the Iraqi Ministry of Health. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests. After Sparacino PLLC filed an administrative appeal of the agency's failure to respond, the agency told the law firm that it would not consider such an appeal. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Sparacino PLLC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Adequacy - Search, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-10-141COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF THE FREEDOM OF INFORMATION ACT against UNITED STATES AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6446135) filed by SPARACINO PLLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet, # 7 Summons to USAID, # 8 Summons to DOJ, # 9 Summons to USAO DC)(Branson, Joshua) (Entered: 10/14/2019)
2019-10-142NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Edward Goldsmith on behalf of SPARACINO PLLC (Goldsmith, Andrew) (Entered: 10/14/2019)
2019-10-143NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew M. Duffy on behalf of SPARACINO PLLC (Duffy, Matthew) (Entered: 10/14/2019)
2019-10-16Case assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zmc) (Entered: 10/16/2019)
2019-10-164SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 10/16/2019)
2019-10-285NOTICE of Appearance by Marsha Wellknown Yee on behalf of UNITED STATES AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 10/28/2019)
2019-11-126RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/21/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/20/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Duffy, Matthew) (Entered: 11/12/2019)
2019-11-127RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/21/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Duffy, Matthew) (Entered: 11/12/2019)
2019-11-128RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT served on 10/21/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Duffy, Matthew) (Entered: 11/12/2019)
2019-11-209ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT.(Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 11/20/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar