Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSouthern Environmental Law Center v. U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service
DistrictEastern District of North Carolina
CityNorthern Division
Case Number2:2019cv00033
Date Filed2019-10-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Terrence W. Boyle
PlaintiffSouthern Environmental Law Center
Case DescriptionThe Southern Environmental Law Center submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service for records concerning the agency's conservation and management of red wolves. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and asked SELC to clarify the request. SELC did so. The agency provided a partial response, disclosing 20 documents in full and four documents in part, claiming Exemption 5 (privileges). SELC filed an administrative appeal. After hearing nothing further from the agency, SELC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Fish and Wildlife Service
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
Complaint attachment 17
Complaint attachment 18
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-10-141COMPLAINT against U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5141737.), filed by Southern Environmental Law Center. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit 1- Correspondence sent via US Mail and Electronic Mail dated 12/5/17, # 3 Exhibit 2- Email dated 12/13/17, # 4 Exhibit 3- Email correspondence, # 5 Exhibit 4- Email correspondence dated 2/5/19 through 2/13/19, # 6 Exhibit 5- Email correspondence dated 2/5/19 through 3/6/19, # 7 Exhibit 6- Email correspondence dated 3/22/19 through 4/5/19, # 8 Exhibit 7- Various email correspondence, # 9 Exhibit 8- Email correspondence dated 3/22/19 through 5/29/19, # 10 Exhibit 9- Various correspondence, # 11 Exhibit 10- Various email correspondence, # 12 Exhibit 11- Correspondence sent via US Mail and Electronic Mail dated 2/19/19, # 13 Exhibit 12- Various Correspondence, # 14 Exhibit 13- Document regarding FOIA Requests, # 15 Exhibit 14- Document from the US Department of Interior, # 16 Proposed Summons Attorney General, # 17 Proposed Summons US Attorney, # 18 Proposed Summons US Fish and Wildlife Service) (McGee, Ramona) Modified on 10/16/2019 to describe exhibits. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 10/14/2019)
2019-10-142Financial Disclosure Statement by Southern Environmental Law Center (McGee, Ramona) (Entered: 10/14/2019)
2019-10-143Notice of Appearance filed by Ramona H. McGee on behalf of Southern Environmental Law Center. (McGee, Ramona) (Entered: 10/14/2019)
2019-10-144Notice of Appearance filed by Sierra B. Weaver on behalf of Southern Environmental Law Center. (Weaver, Sierra) (Entered: 10/14/2019)
2019-10-16Notice to Counsel - Counsel did not properly identify attachments pursuant to Section V.E. of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. Attachments must be clearly labeled (i.e., "Exhibit 1" is not a sufficient description). Additionally, when filing a document with more than five attachments, the first attachment must be an index of all of the subsequent attached documents. No further action is required. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 10/16/2019)
2019-10-165Summons Issued as to U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, Attorney General and US Attorney. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) . (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 10/16/2019)
2019-11-196MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding 1 Complaint,,,, filed by U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Fowler, Neal) (Entered: 11/19/2019)
2019-11-197RESPONSE in Opposition regarding 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding 1 Complaint,,,, filed by Southern Environmental Law Center. (McGee, Ramona) (Entered: 11/19/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar