Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThe Burkhalter Law Firm, P.C. v. The Department of Energy, National Nuclear Security Administration
DistrictEastern District of Tennessee
CityKnoxville
Case Number3:2019cv00403
Date Filed2019-10-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeDistrict Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr
PlaintiffThe Burkhalter Law Firm, P.C.
Case DescriptionThe Burkhalter Law Firm submitted a FOIA request to the National Nuclear Security Administration for records concerning agency official John Crapo's emails. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and indicated it would respond. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the Burkhalter Law Firm filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantThe Department of Energy, National Nuclear Security Administration
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-10-141COMPLAINT against The Department of Energy, National Nuclear Security Administration ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4102635.), filed by The Burkhalter Law Firm, P.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Summons Secretary of Energy, # 3 Summons Summons US Attorney, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Burkhalter, David) (Entered: 10/14/2019)
2019-10-15District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (AML) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
2019-10-152Summons Issued as to The Department of Energy, National Nuclear Security Administration. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Issued as to Department of Energy c/o US Attorney J. Douglas Overby)(AML) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
2019-10-153Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 10/15/2019. (AML) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
2019-10-154Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 10/15/2019. (AML) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
2019-10-155Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 10/15/2019. (AML) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
2019-10-15NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by The Burkhalter Law Firm, P.C. (AML) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
2019-10-156Certificate of Corporate Interest by The Burkhalter Law Firm, P.C.. (Burkhalter, David) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
2019-10-177NOTICE by The Burkhalter Law Firm, P.C. Notice of Plaintiff's Waiver of Trial by Jury (Burkhalter, David) (Entered: 10/17/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar