Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCENTER FOR REPRODUCTIVE RIGHTS v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv03068
Date Filed2019-10-15
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffCENTER FOR REPRODUCTIVE RIGHTS
Case DescriptionThe Center for Reproductive Rights submitted two FOIA requests to the Department of Health and Human Services. The first request asked for records concerning the budget for the Conscience and Religious Freedom Division, part of the Office of Civil Rights. The second FOIA request asked for records concerning plans to expend settlement funds received as a result of HIPAA violation enforcement. The agency acknowledged receipt of both requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Center for Reproductive Rights filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Adequacy - Search, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-10-151COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6447433) filed by CENTER FOR REPRODUCTIVE RIGHTS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Summons)(Kotagal, Kalpana) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
2019-10-17Case assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zmc) (Entered: 10/17/2019)
2019-10-172SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 10/17/2019)
2019-10-183LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTER FOR REPRODUCTIVE RIGHTS (Kotagal, Kalpana) (Entered: 10/18/2019)
2019-11-134MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Alice Buttrick, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6560162. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CENTER FOR REPRODUCTIVE RIGHTS (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Alice Buttrick, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kotagal, Kalpana) (Entered: 11/13/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar