Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleEVERYTOWN FOR GUN SAFETY SUPPORT FUND v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv03103
Date Filed2019-10-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffEVERYTOWN FOR GUN SAFETY SUPPORT FUND
Case DescriptionEverytown for Gun Safety submitted two FOIA requests to the Department of Justice. Its first FOIA request asked for records concerning communications between DOJ officials and the National Rifle Association, the National Rifle Association Institute for Legislative Action, or the National Shooting Sports Association since February 2018. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and divided the request into four separate requests. Everytown's second FOIA request asked for records concerning communications between DOJ officials and certain gun lobbying organizations and gun industry members pertaining to the failure of legislative initiatives in 2015 and 2016 to curb gun violence. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and divided it into four separate requests. The agency asked Everytown to narrow the scope of its requests, which Everytown rejected because it believed such a narrowing would exclude the third-party communications it was seeking. After the agency failed to respond substantively, Everytown for Gun Safety filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-10-161COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6453860) filed by EVERYTOWN FOR GUN SAFETY SUPPORT FUND. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Civil Cover Sheet, # 9 Summons to DOJ, # 10 Summons to United States of America per FRCP 4(i)(2))(Hussain, Murad) (Entered: 10/16/2019)
2019-10-162LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by EVERYTOWN FOR GUN SAFETY SUPPORT FUND (Hussain, Murad) (Entered: 10/16/2019)
2019-10-17Case assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zmc) (Entered: 10/17/2019)
2019-10-173REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by EVERYTOWN FOR GUN SAFETY SUPPORT FUND.(Hussain, Murad) (Entered: 10/17/2019)
2019-10-174SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, and U.S. Attorney (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 10/17/2019)
2019-10-235ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 10/23/19.(DM) (Entered: 10/23/2019)
2019-11-106RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/24/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/23/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 10/24/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Hussain, Murad) (Entered: 11/10/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar