Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBLIXSETH v. U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv03117
Date Filed2019-10-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffTIMOTHY BLIXSETH
Case DescriptionTimothy Blixseth submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Customs and Border Protection for records concerning himself, his former airplane, and several companies. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and asked Blixseth to provide authorization for disclosure to his attorney. Blixseth did so, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Blixseth filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
DefendantU.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
1300 Pennsylvania Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20229
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-10-171COMPLAINT against U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6457839) filed by TIMOTHY BLIXSETH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet, # 7 Summons, # 8 Summons, # 9 Summons)(Himes, Lisa) (Entered: 10/17/2019)
2019-10-172NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by TIMOTHY BLIXSETH. Case related to Case No. 18-00593, 18-02281,19-01292, 19-02297. (Himes, Lisa) (Entered: 10/17/2019)
2019-10-18Case assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zmc) (Entered: 10/18/2019)
2019-10-18Case reassigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. Judge Amit P. Mehta is no longer assigned to the case. (zmc) (Entered: 10/18/2019)
2019-10-183SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 10/18/2019)
2019-10-234NOTICE of Appearance by Johnny Hillary Walker, III on behalf of U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 10/23/2019)
2019-10-245RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/22/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/21/2019. (Himes, Lisa) (Entered: 10/24/2019)
2019-10-246RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/22/2019. (Himes, Lisa) (Entered: 10/24/2019)
2019-10-247RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION served on 10/22/2019 (Himes, Lisa) (Entered: 10/24/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar