Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleEcological Rights Foundation v. National Oceanic And Atmospheric Administration
DistrictNorthern District of California
CityOakland
Case Number4:2019cv06661
Date Filed2019-10-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Jon S. Tigar
PlaintiffEcological Rights Foundation
Case DescriptionThe Ecological Rights Foundation submitted a FOIA request to the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration for records concerning interference by President Donald Trump and other White House officials pertaining to forecasting where Hurricane Dorian would hit the U.S. mainland. After hearing nothing from agency, Ecological Rights Foundation filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantNational Oceanic And Atmospheric Administration
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-10-171COMPLAINT against National Oceanic And Atmospheric Administration ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13801048.). Filed byEcological Rights Foundation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - FOIA Request, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Email to NOAA, # 3 Summons Attorney General William Barr, # 4 Summons Civil Process Clerk, # 5 Summons National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sproul, Christopher) (Filed on 10/17/2019) (Entered: 10/17/2019)
2019-10-172Certificate of Interested Entities by Ecological Rights Foundation (Sproul, Christopher) (Filed on 10/17/2019) (Entered: 10/17/2019)
2019-10-173Civil Cover Sheet by Ecological Rights Foundation Corrected Civil Cover Sheet . (Sproul, Christopher) (Filed on 10/17/2019) (Entered: 10/17/2019)
2019-10-174Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/31/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2019) (Entered: 10/17/2019)
2019-10-175Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/14/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/21/2020 02:00 PM in McKinleyville.Parties may participate in the Initial Case Management Conference by telephone and should contact Judge Illman's courtroom deputy for instructions. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2019) (Entered: 10/17/2019)
2019-10-186CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ecological Rights Foundation.. (Sproul, Christopher) (Filed on 10/18/2019) (Entered: 10/18/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar