Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBUTT v. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv03080
Date Filed2019-10-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffBABAR JAVED BUTT
DefendantCENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantEXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR IMMIGRATION REVIEW
DefendantIMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-10-10Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 10/10/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zeg) (Entered: 10/17/2019)
2019-10-101COMPLAINT against CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR IMMIGRATION REVIEW, IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE filed by BABAR JAVED BUTT.(zeg). (Entered: 10/17/2019)
2019-10-102MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by BABAR JAVED BUTT (zeg). (Entered: 10/17/2019)
2019-10-103MOTION to issue summons by BABAR JAVED BUTT (zeg). (Entered: 10/17/2019)
2019-10-104PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by BABAR JAVED BUTT (zeg). (Entered: 10/17/2019)
2019-10-295ORDER directing an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $26.66 from Prison Account of BABAR JAVED BUTT and granting MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (see order for full details). Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/24/19. (zmd) (Entered: 10/29/2019)
2019-10-29Case Directly Reassigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (zmd) (Entered: 10/29/2019)
2019-10-296NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by BABAR JAVED BUTT. Case related to Case No. 19-155 (JEB). (zmd) (Entered: 10/29/2019)
2019-10-29MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that Plaintiff's 3 Motion to Issue Summons is GRANTED IN PART inasmuch as the Clerk is directed to have the USMS serve Defendants. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 10/29/2019. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 10/29/2019)
2019-10-317SUMMONS (8) Issued as to CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR IMMIGRATION REVIEW, IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (zjd) (Entered: 10/31/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar