Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv03127
Date Filed2019-10-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffCITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON
Case DescriptionCitizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Homeland Security and the Department of State. CREW's FOIA request to U.S. Secret Service asked for records concerning communications that support President Trump's assertion that the agency preferred his Doral resort as the site for the G-7 summit. CREW also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and invoked a 10-day extension for responding. CREW's FOIA request to the Department of State asked for records concerning the consideration of Doral as the site of the G-7 summit. CREW also asked for a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and invoked a 10-day extension. CREW sent a second FOIA request to State for records supporting Trump's assertion that the Bureau of Diplomatic Security preferred Doral as the site of the G-7 summit. CREW also requested a fee waiver for the request. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and invoked a 10-day extension. After hearing nothing further from either agency pertaining to its requests, CREW filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-10-181COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6461540) filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Dep't of Homeland Security, # 3 Summons Dep't of State, # 4 Summons Attorney General, # 5 Summons US. Attorney)(Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 10/18/2019)
2019-10-182LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 10/18/2019)
2019-10-21Case assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zmc) (Entered: 10/21/2019)
2019-10-213SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 10/21/2019)
2019-10-234ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 10/23/19. (DM) (Entered: 10/23/2019)
2019-11-135RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 11/12/2019; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 10/24/2019, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/24/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/23/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/24/19. (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 11/13/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar