Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSPARACINO PLLC v. THE NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv03134
Date Filed2019-10-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Carl J. Nichols
PlaintiffSPARACINO PLLC
Case DescriptionThe law firm of Sparacino PLLC, which represents individuals and families of individuals who had been killed or injured by terrorist attacks in Iraq, submitted a FOIA request to the National Archives and Records Administration for records concerning the Iraqi Ministry of Health. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Sparacino PLLC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantNATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-10-181COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF THE FREEDOM OF INFORMATION ACT against THE NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6462564) filed by SPARACINO PLLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Cormier, Christopher) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/28/2019) (zjf). (Entered: 10/18/2019)
2019-10-21Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (adh, ) (Entered: 10/21/2019)
2019-10-212SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 10/21/2019)
2019-10-253RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION served on 10/23/2019 (Cormier, Christopher) (Entered: 10/25/2019)
2019-10-254REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE to U.S. Attorney General and U.S. Attorney for District of Columbia filed by SPARACINO PLLC. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(Cormier, Christopher) (Entered: 10/25/2019)
2019-10-28SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf) (Entered: 10/28/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar