Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSPARACINO PLLC v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv03136
Date Filed2019-10-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffSPARACINO PLLC
Case DescriptionThe law firm of Sparacino PLLC, which represents individuals and families of individuals who had been killed or injured by terrorist attacks in Iraq, submitted four FOIA requests to the Department of Defense for records concerning the Iraqi Ministry of Health. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Sparacino PLLC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Adequacy - Search, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-10-181COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF THE FREEDOM OF INFORMATION ACT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6462883) filed by SPARACINO PLLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Cormier, Christopher) (Entered: 10/18/2019)
2019-10-21Case assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zmc) (Entered: 10/21/2019)
2019-10-212SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 10/21/2019)
2019-10-253RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 10/24/2019 (Cormier, Christopher) (Entered: 10/25/2019)
2019-10-254REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE to U.S. Attorney General and U.S. Attorney for District of Columbia filed by SPARACINO PLLC. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(Cormier, Christopher) (Entered: 10/25/2019)
2019-10-295SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf) (Entered: 10/29/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar