Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleInternational Refugee Assistance Project et al v. Federal Bureau of Investigation et al
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2019cv06809
Date Filed2019-10-21
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero
PlaintiffInternational Refugee Assistance Project
PlaintiffMuslim Advocates
PlaintiffACLU of Northern California
Case DescriptionThe International Refugee Project, Muslim Advocates, and the ACLU of Northern California submitted FOIA requests to the FBI, the Department of Justice, the Department of Homeland Security, and the Department of State for records concerning investigation and surveillance of refugees living in the United States. The plaintiffs also requested a fee waiver. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests. DHS and the FBI told IRAP that the request was too broad to allow for a search. IRAP appealed those decisions. The Office of Information Policy upheld the FBI's determination that the request was too broad. After hearing nothing further from the agencies, IRAP, Muslim Advocates, and the ACLU of Northern California filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFederal Bureau of Investigation
DefendantU.S. Department of Homeland Security
DefendantU.S. Department of Justice
DefendantU.S. Department of State
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
Complaint attachment 17
Complaint attachment 18
Complaint attachment 19
Complaint attachment 20
Complaint attachment 21
Complaint attachment 22
Complaint attachment 23
Complaint attachment 24
Complaint attachment 25
Complaint attachment 26
Complaint attachment 27
Complaint attachment 28
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-10-211COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief for Violation of the Freedom of Information Act, 5 U.S.C. Section 552, et seq. against Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Department of State (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-13810487.). Filed by International Refugee Assistance Project, ACLU of Northern California, Muslim Advocates. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E-1, # 6 Exhibit E-2, # 7 Exhibit E-3, # 8 Exhibit E-4, # 9 Exhibit E-5, # 10 Exhibit E-6, # 11 Exhibit E-7, # 12 Exhibit E-8, # 13 Exhibit E-9, # 14 Exhibit E-10, # 15 Exhibit E-11, # 16 Exhibit E-12, # 17 Exhibit E-13, # 18 Exhibit F, # 19 Exhibit G, # 20 Exhibit H, # 21 Exhibit I, # 22 Exhibit J, # 23 Exhibit K, # 24 Exhibit L, # 25 Exhibit M, # 26 Exhibit N, # 27 Exhibit O, # 28 Civil Cover Sheet) (Loran III, Thomas) (Filed on 10/21/2019) Modified on 10/29/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/21/2019)
2019-10-212Proposed Summons. (Loran III, Thomas) (Filed on 10/21/2019) (Entered: 10/21/2019)
2019-10-213Statement Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 Disclosure Statement and Civil L.R. 3-15 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons by ACLU of Northern California, International Refugee Assistance Project, Muslim Advocates. (Loran III, Thomas) (Filed on 10/21/2019) Modified on 10/29/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/21/2019)
2019-10-224Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/5/2019. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2019) (Entered: 10/22/2019)
2019-10-295Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/17/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/24/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2019) (Entered: 10/29/2019)
2019-10-296Summons Issued as to Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Department of State. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2019) (Entered: 10/29/2019)
2019-11-057CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by ACLU of Northern California, International Refugee Assistance Project, Muslim Advocates.. (Romino, Elyssa) (Filed on 11/5/2019) (Entered: 11/05/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar