Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY v. BUREAU OF SAFETY AND ENVIRONMENTAL ENFORCEMENT et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv03154
Date Filed2019-10-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffCENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY
Case DescriptionThe Center for Biological Diversity submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Safety and Environmental Enforcement for records concerning wells in the Gulf of Mexico OCS Region where hydraulic fracturing had been used. CBD also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and denied CBD's request for a fee waiver. The agency told CBD that its request was put on the complex track for processing and that the cost of records would be approximately $8,000. CBD filed an administrative appeal of the agency's denial of its fee waiver request. The agency subsequently granted CBD's fee waiver request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, CBD filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantBUREAU OF SAFETY AND ENVIRONMENTAL ENFORCEMENT
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-10-221COMPLAINT against BUREAU OF SAFETY AND ENVIRONMENTAL ENFORCEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6467206) filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons to the Bureau of Safety and Environmental Enforcement, # 3 Summons to the U.S. Department of the Interior, # 4 Summons to the U.S. Attorney, # 5 Summons to the Attorney General)(Kilduff, Catherine) (Entered: 10/22/2019)
2019-10-222LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY (Kilduff, Catherine) (Entered: 10/22/2019)
2019-10-223MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Cari Miyoko Sakashita, :Firm- Center for Biological Diversity, :Address- 1212 Broadway, Suite 800; Oakland, CA 94612. Phone No. - (510) 844-7108. Fax No. - (510) 844-7150 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6470742. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cari Miyoko Sakashita, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kilduff, Catherine) (Entered: 10/22/2019)
2019-10-23Case assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zmc) (Entered: 10/23/2019)
2019-10-244SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to BUREAU OF SAFETY AND ENVIRONMENTAL ENFORCEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 10/24/2019)
2019-10-24MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiff's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice, Dkt. 3 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Cari Miyoko Sakashita is hereby granted leave to appear pro hac vice in this case. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Click for instructions . Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/24/2019. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 10/24/2019)
2019-10-245STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/24/2019. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 10/24/2019)
2019-10-256NOTICE of Appearance by Cari Miyoko Sakashita on behalf of CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY (Sakashita, Cari) (Entered: 10/25/2019)
2019-11-127RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/6/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/6/2019. (Sakashita, Cari) (Entered: 11/12/2019)
2019-11-128RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General November 4, 2019. (Sakashita, Cari) (Entered: 11/12/2019)
2019-11-129RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. BUREAU OF SAFETY AND ENVIRONMENTAL ENFORCEMENT served on 11/12/2019; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR served on 11/4/2019 (Sakashita, Cari) (Entered: 11/12/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar