Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION v. BUREAU OF SAFETY AND ENVIRONMENTAL ENFORCEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv03164
Date Filed2019-10-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Carl J. Nichols
PlaintiffDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionDemocracy Forward Foundation submitted two FOIA requests to the Bureau of Safety and Environmental Enforcement for records concerning the grant of waivers to offshore drilling safety requirements. DFF also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the one of the requests. After hearing nothing further from the agency pertaining to either request, DFF filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantBUREAU OF SAFETY AND ENVIRONMENTAL ENFORCEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-10-221COMPLAINT against BUREAU OF SAFETY AND ENVIRONMENTAL ENFORCEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6470296) filed by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons)(Miller, Kristen) (Entered: 10/22/2019)
2019-10-222LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION (Miller, Kristen) (Entered: 10/22/2019)
2019-10-24Case assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zmc) (Entered: 10/24/2019)
2019-10-253SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to BUREAU OF SAFETY AND ENVIRONMENTAL ENFORCEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 10/25/2019)
2019-10-304RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. BUREAU OF SAFETY AND ENVIRONMENTAL ENFORCEMENT served on 10/28/2019, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/28/19., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/28/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/27/2019.) (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Miller, Kristen) (Entered: 10/30/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar