Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFIREARMS POLICY FOUNDATION et al v. US DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv03184
Date Filed2019-10-23
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffFIREARMS POLICY FOUNDATION
PlaintiffFIREARMS POLICY COALITION, INC.
PlaintiffBRANDON COMBS
Case DescriptionThe Firearms Policy Foundation submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning 3-D printable guns and issues related to that process. FPF submitted a second FOIA request for the same records but for a longer time period. FPF also requested a fee waiver and expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, FPF filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUS DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Defendant2255
US DEPARTMENT OF STATE
2201 C St NW
Washington, DC 20520
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-10-231COMPLAINT against US DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6474591) filed by FIREARMS POLICY FOUNDATION, BRANDON COMBS, FIREARMS POLICY COALITION, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit 8.22.2018 FOIA Request, # 3 Exhibit 12.18.2018 FOIA Request, # 4 Exhibit LR26.1 Certificate, # 5 Summons Proposed summons, # 6 Summons Proposed summons, # 7 Summons Proposed summons)(Stamboulieh, Stephen) (Entered: 10/23/2019)
2019-10-242NOTICE of Appearance by Alan Alexander Beck on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Beck, Alan) (Entered: 10/24/2019)
2019-10-25Case assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zmc) (Entered: 10/25/2019)
2019-10-283SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to US DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 10/28/2019)
2019-11-044RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/4/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/4/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/4/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. US DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 11/4/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Return Receipt CIvil Process Clerk, # 2 Declaration Service on Attorney General, # 3 Exhibit Return Receipt Attorney General, # 4 Declaration Service on Department of State, # 5 Exhibit Return Receipt Department of State)(Stamboulieh, Stephen) (Entered: 11/04/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar