Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDanny Fabricant v. Department of Justice
DistrictCentral District of California
CityWestern Division - Los Angeles
Case Number2:2019cv09081
Date Filed2019-10-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dolly M. Gee
PlaintiffDanny Fabricant
Case DescriptionDanny Fabricant, a federal prisoner, submitted 11 FOIA requests to the Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco and Firearms for records concerning the agency's investigation that led to his conviction. The agency acknowledged 10 of the requests. Fabricant filed administrative appeals because of the agency's failure to respond to his requests. The Office of Information Policy rejected his appeals because the agency had not yet made an adverse determination. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Fabricant filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Recovery of Costs

DefendantDepartment of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-10-221COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against Defendant Department of Justice. Case assigned to Judge Dolly M. Gee for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge John D. Early., filed by Plaintiff Danny Fabricant. (et) (Entered: 10/24/2019)
2019-10-222REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Danny Fabricant. (et) (Entered: 10/24/2019)
2019-10-223NOTICE OF LODGING Appendix I filed by Plaintiff Danny Fabricant. (Attachments: # 1 Lodged Appendix I)(et) (Entered: 10/24/2019)
2019-10-224NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (et) (Entered: 10/24/2019)
2019-10-225NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 10/24/2019)
2019-10-28RECOMMENDATION issued by Magistrate Judge John D. Early. Re REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support 2 . Proposed Order forwarded to the District Judge for approval.(mba) (Entered: 10/28/2019)
2019-10-296ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: granting 2 REQUEST for Leave to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fee. IT IS ORDERED that the Request to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees is: GRANTED subject to the initial filing fee recommended by the U.S. Magistrate Judge and the subsequent monthly payments required by 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(2). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that: Plaintiff SHALL PAY THE FILING FEES IN FULL within 30 days or this case will be dismissed. (see document for further details) (hr) (Entered: 10/29/2019)
2019-11-017INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti) (Entered: 11/01/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar