Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleUMASS MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC. et al v. SAUL
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv03211
Date Filed2019-10-25
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffUMASS MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC.
PlaintiffALBANY MEDICAL CENTER HOSPITAL
Case DescriptionUMass Memorial Medical Center and Albany Medical Center Hospital submitted a FOIA request to the Social Security Administration for records concerning supplemental security income display records for 433 deceased Medicare beneficiaries who had received treatment at Medicare-participating disproportionate hospitals. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and denied it entirely under Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy). The hospitals filed an administrative appeal of the denial. The agency then changed its mind and decided to process the request if the hospitals could verify that the patients were deceased. After discussions about the scope of the request, the agency indicated that it had misunderstood the request and planned to charge the hospitals $5,000 for processing the request. After the agency failed to provide the records, the records, the hospital filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantANDREW SAUL in his official capacity as Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
DefendantSOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
Complaint attachment 17
Complaint attachment 18
Complaint attachment 19
Complaint attachment 20
Complaint attachment 21
Complaint attachment 22
Complaint attachment 23
Complaint attachment 24
Complaint attachment 25
Complaint attachment 26
Complaint attachment 27
Complaint attachment 28
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-10-251COMPLAINT against ANDREW SAUL ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6479310) filed by ALBANY MEDICAL CENTER HOSPITAL, UMASS MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Civil Cover Sheet, # 26 Summons Attorney General, # 27 Summons Commissioner, # 28 Summons U.S. Attorney)(Webster, Stephanie) (Entered: 10/25/2019)
2019-10-252LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ALBANY MEDICAL CENTER HOSPITAL, UMASS MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC. (Webster, Stephanie) (Entered: 10/25/2019)
2019-10-28Case assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zmc) (Entered: 10/28/2019)
2019-10-293SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ANDREW SAUL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 10/29/2019)
2019-11-124RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/30/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/29/2019. (Webster, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/12/2019)
2019-11-125RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/1/2019. (Webster, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/12/2019)
2019-11-126RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ANDREW SAUL served on 10/31/2019 (Webster, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/12/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar