Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv03213
Date Filed2019-10-25
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted three FOIA requests to OMB for records concerning the decision to hold up funding to Ukraine and the agency's role in Ukraine policy. American Oversight also requested expedited processing for its requests. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency pertaining to any of its requests, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Expedited processing, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantOFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-10-251COMPLAINT against OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6479781) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons)(McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 10/25/2019)
2019-10-252LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 10/25/2019)
2019-10-28Case assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zmc) (Entered: 10/28/2019)
2019-10-283SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 10/28/2019)
2019-11-074AMENDED COMPLAINT against OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D)(McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 11/07/2019)
2019-11-125SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (ztth) (Entered: 11/12/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar