Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJEMERIGBE v. TRUMP et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv03167
Date Filed2019-10-16
Date Closed2019-11-05
JudgeUnassigned
PlaintiffPAUL JEMERIGBE
DefendantDONALD TRUMP Chief Executive Officer of the United States Office of the President
DefendantWILLIAM P. BARR United States Attorney General, Department of Justice
DefendantSUSAN B. GERSON Assistant Director, Office of the United States Attorneys
DefendantJOHN DOE Associate Director, Office of Information Policy
DefendantDAVID L. HARLOW Deputy Director, United States Marshal Service
DefendantWILLIAM E. BORDLEY Associate General Counsel, United States Marshal Service, and;
DefendantJOHN DOE Director of the Bureau of Prisons, Department of Justice
Documents
Docket
Opinion/Order [4]
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-10-16Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 10/16/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zmd) (Entered: 10/24/2019)
2019-10-314MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/31/2019. (zad) (Entered: 11/05/2019)
2019-10-315ORDER granting plaintiff's 2 application to proceed in forma pauperis; it is FURTHER ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A(b)(1), the complaint and this case are DISMISSED without prejudice. This is a final appealable Order. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/31/2019. (zad) (Entered: 11/05/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar