Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv03232
Date Filed2019-10-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffPROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC.
Case DescriptionProtect Democracy Project submitted FOIA requests to the FBI and U.S. Secret Service for records concerning explicit or implicit threats of violence by white supremacists or hate groups received by the agencies pertaining to the Trump campaign. PDP also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. Both agencies acknowledged receipt of the request. The Secret Service told PDP that its request was too broad to search. PDP narrowed its request, but after hearing nothing further from the agencies, PDP filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Vaughn index, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Expedited processing, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-10-281COMPLAINT against All Defendants (U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE AND U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY) ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6483099) filed by PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Summons DOJ, # 10 Summons DHS, # 11 Summons AG, # 12 Summons USAO, # 13 Civil Cover Sheet)(Florence, Justin) (Entered: 10/28/2019)
2019-10-30Case assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zmc) (Entered: 10/30/2019)
2019-10-302STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 10/30/2019. (lctnm1) (Entered: 10/30/2019)
2019-10-303LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC. (Florence, Justin) (Entered: 10/30/2019)
2019-10-304SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 10/30/2019)
2019-11-045MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Genevieve C. Nadeau, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6505040. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Florence, Justin) (Entered: 11/04/2019)
2019-11-046MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Stephanie Llanes, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6505087. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Florence, Justin) (Entered: 11/04/2019)
2019-11-05MINUTE ORDER granting the 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Genevieve C. Nadeau. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Click for instructions . Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 11/05/2019. (lctnm1) (Entered: 11/05/2019)
2019-11-05MINUTE ORDER granting the 6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Stephanie Llanes. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Click for instructions . Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 11/05/19. (lctnm1) (Entered: 11/05/2019)
2019-11-067RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/4/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/4/2019. (Florence, Justin) (Entered: 11/06/2019)
2019-11-068RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/04/2019. (Florence, Justin) (Entered: 11/06/2019)
2019-11-069RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 11/4/2019; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 11/4/2019 (Florence, Justin) (Entered: 11/06/2019)
2019-11-1210NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Boyd Palmer-Ball on behalf of All Defendants (Palmer-Ball, Katherine) (Entered: 11/12/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar