Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNATIONAL STUDENT LEGAL DEFENSE NETWORK v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv03254
Date Filed2019-10-29
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffNATIONAL STUDENT LEGAL DEFENSE NETWORK
Case DescriptionThe National Student Legal Defense Network submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Education for records concerning communications between agency officials and representatives of specific firms pertaining to a list of keywords. NSLDN also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and granted NSLDN's request for a fee waiver. The agency told NSLDN that it needed to provide domain names to search for emails from outside firms. NSLDN provided the domain names. The agency told NSLDN that its request qualified for unusual circumstances. After hearing nothing further from the agency, NSLDN filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-10-291COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6488138) filed by NATIONAL STUDENT LEGAL DEFENSE NETWORK. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Elson, Alexander) (Entered: 10/29/2019)
2019-10-292LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NATIONAL STUDENT LEGAL DEFENSE NETWORK (Elson, Alexander) (Entered: 10/29/2019)
2019-10-31Case assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zmc) (Entered: 10/31/2019)
2019-10-313SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 10/31/2019)
2019-11-064RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION served on 11/5/2019, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/06/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/6/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/6/2019.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Elson, Alexander) (Entered: 11/06/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar