Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleRODRIGUEZ GOMEZ v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv03255
Date Filed2019-10-29
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffJOSE ANGEL RODRIGUEZ GOMEZ
Case DescriptionJose Angel Rodriguez Gomez submitted a FOIA request to the U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia for records concerning a car accident that occurred on March 25, 2018 in Washington, DC. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Rodriguez Gomez filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-10-291COMPLAINT against JOSE ANGEL RODRIGUEZ GOMEZ ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6488356) filed by JOSE ANGEL RODRIGUEZ GOMEZ. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit A- Order of DC Superior Court Judge, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit B - FOIA Request)(Tirana, Akil) (Entered: 10/29/2019)
2019-10-31Case assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zmc) (Entered: 10/31/2019)
2019-10-312SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 10/31/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar