Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWilson-Davis & Co. v. US Securities and Exchange Commission
DistrictDistrict of Utah
CityCentral
Case Number2:2019cv00839
Date Filed2019-10-29
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Howard C. Nielson, Jr
PlaintiffWilson-Davis & Co. a Utah corporation
DefendantUS Securities and Exchange Commission a Government Agency
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-10-291Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr.. Plaintiff Wilson-Davis & Co. is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day. NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nl) (Entered: 10/29/2019)
2019-10-292COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against US Securities and Exchange Commission (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3406271) filed by Wilson-Davis & Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit 14) Assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr (Ensor, Richard) (Entered: 10/29/2019)
2019-10-303ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 10/30/2019. (las) (Entered: 10/30/2019)
2019-10-304**RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** Summons Issued Electronically as to US Attorney's Office District of Utah. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl) (Entered: 10/30/2019)
2019-10-315**RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** Summons Issued Electronically as to US Securities and Exchange Commission. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl) (Entered: 10/31/2019)
2019-11-016ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 11/1/2019. (las) (Entered: 11/01/2019)
2019-11-067**RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilson-Davis & Co.. US Securities and Exchange Commission served on 11/4/2019, answer due 1/3/2020. (Ensor, Richard) (Entered: 11/06/2019)
2019-11-088NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Robert Tallarico on behalf of US Securities and Exchange Commission (Tallarico, Mark) (Entered: 11/08/2019)
2019-11-159CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wilson-Davis & Co. Summons and Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Ensor, Richard) (Entered: 11/15/2019)
2019-12-0310Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint filed by US Securities and Exchange Commission.(Tallarico, Mark) (Entered: 12/03/2019)
2019-12-0611REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Freeland, Anne) (Entered: 12/06/2019)
2019-12-0612SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 2/19/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 2/19/2020. Motions due by 3/31/2020. Status Conference set for 4/7/2020 at 10:00 AM in Rm 7.300 before Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 12/6/2019. (las) (Entered: 12/06/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar