Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNATIONAL STUDENT LEGAL DEFENSE NETWORK v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv03264
Date Filed2019-10-30
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffNATIONAL STUDENT LEGAL DEFENSE NETWORK
Case DescriptionThe National Student Legal Defense Network submitted two FOIA requests to the Department of Education for records concerning the agency's 2016 Borrower Defense Rule. NSLDN also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, granted NSLDN's request for a fee waiver, and told NSLDN that it could not provide an estimated date of completion. After hearing nothing further from the agency, NSLDN filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-10-301COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6491653) filed by NATIONAL STUDENT LEGAL DEFENSE NETWORK. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Bitner, Robyn) (Entered: 10/30/2019)
2019-10-302LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NATIONAL STUDENT LEGAL DEFENSE NETWORK (Bitner, Robyn) (Entered: 10/30/2019)
2019-10-31Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zrdj) (Entered: 10/31/2019)
2019-10-313SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj) (Entered: 10/31/2019)
2019-11-064RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/06/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION served on 11/5/2019, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/6/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/6/2019.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bitner, Robyn) (Entered: 11/06/2019)
2019-11-075STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 11/07/19. (Attachment: Exhibit 1) (mac) (Entered: 11/07/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar