Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleENVIRONMENTAL DEFENSE FUND v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv03286
Date Filed2019-10-31
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffENVIRONMENTAL DEFENSE FUND
Case DescriptionThe Environmental Defense Fund submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Interior, National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration, and National Aeronautics and Space Administration for records concerning the White House's effort to review or evaluate climate science. EDF also requested a fee waiver and expedited processing. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests. Interior and NOAA granted EDF's request for expedited processing. NOAA also granted EDF's request for a fee waiver. However, EDF heard nothing further from either agency. NASA responded to EDF's request but withheld two records because they originated with the National Security Council and were not considered agency records. EDF filed an administrative appeal of that decision. After hearing nothing further from any of the agencies, EDF filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
DefendantNATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION
DefendantNATIONAL AERONAUTICS AND SPACE ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-10-311COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6495045) filed by ENVIRONMENTAL DEFENSE FUND. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-E, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons Summons to U.S. Department of the Interior, # 4 Summons Summons to National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration, # 5 Summons Summons to National Aeronautics and Space Administration, # 6 Summons Summons to U.S. Attorney General, # 7 Summons Summons to U.S. Attorney)(Levitan, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/31/2019)
2019-10-312LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ENVIRONMENTAL DEFENSE FUND (Levitan, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/31/2019)
2019-11-01Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zrdj) (Entered: 11/01/2019)
2019-11-01SUMMONS Not Issued as to NATIONAL AERONAUTICS AND SPACE ADMINISTRATION, NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (zrdj) (Entered: 11/01/2019)
2019-11-013REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re 1 Complaint,, filed by ENVIRONMENTAL DEFENSE FUND. Related document: 1 Complaint,, filed by ENVIRONMENTAL DEFENSE FUND. (Attachments: # 1 Summons National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration, # 2 Summons National Aeronautics and Space Administration, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney's Office)(Levitan, Benjamin) (Entered: 11/01/2019)
2019-11-044SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL AERONAUTICS AND SPACE ADMINISTRATION, NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR., SUMMONS Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL AERONAUTICS AND SPACE ADMINISTRATION, NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent) (ztth) (Entered: 11/04/2019)
2019-11-055MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Nathaniel Hunt, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6507468. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ENVIRONMENTAL DEFENSE FUND (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Nathaniel Hunt, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Levitan, Benjamin) (Entered: 11/05/2019)
2019-11-056MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Nicholas Clabbers, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6507491. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ENVIRONMENTAL DEFENSE FUND (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Nicholas Clabbers, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Levitan, Benjamin) (Entered: 11/05/2019)
2019-11-05MINUTE ORDER denying 6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: The Court notes that Nicholas Clabbers is admitted to the District of Columbia Bar and maintains an office within the District of Columbia. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.2(c)(2) ("Practice by Non-Members of the Bar of this Court"), "[a]n attorney who engages in the practice of law from an office located in the District of Columbia must be a member of... the Bar of this Court to file papers in this Court." Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.8(a), attorneys who are active members in good standing of the District of Columbia Bar may petition the Clerk for admission to the bar of this court. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on November 5, 2019. (lcrc3) (Entered: 11/05/2019)
2019-11-05ORDER granting 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.2, it is hereby ORDERED that Nathaniel Hunt is admitted to represent Plaintiff pro hac vice in this case. SO ORDERED. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Click for instructions . Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on November 5, 2019. (lcrc3) (Entered: 11/05/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar