Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAmerican Civil Liberties Union et al v. United States Department of Justice et al
DistrictDistrict of Massachusetts
CityBoston
Case Number1:2019cv12242
Date Filed2019-10-31
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge William G. Young
PlaintiffAmerican Civil Liberties Union
PlaintiffAmerican Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts
Case DescriptionThe ACLU and the ACLU of Massachusetts submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Justice, the FBI, and the DEA for records concerning development and use of facial recognition. The ACLU also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests, denied the ACLU's request for expedited processing and put the ACLU in the preferential fee category. After hearing nothing further from the agencies, the ACLU filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantFederal Bureau of Investigation
DefendantDrug Enforcement Administration
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-10-311COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7948899 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Category Sheet)(McFadden, Daniel) (Entered: 10/31/2019)
2019-10-312NOTICE of Appearance by David Glod on behalf of American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts (Glod, David) (Entered: 10/31/2019)
2019-10-313NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded here . These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 10/31/2019)
2019-10-314Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Pacho, Arnold) (Entered: 10/31/2019)
2019-10-315MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Brett Max Kaufman and Nathan Freed Wessler Filing fee: $ 200, receipt number 0101-7949544 by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Affidavit)(McFadden, Daniel) (Entered: 10/31/2019)
2019-10-316NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Segal on behalf of American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts (Segal, Matthew) (Entered: 10/31/2019)
2019-11-017Refusal to Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. . (McFadden, Daniel) (Entered: 11/01/2019)
2019-11-018NOTICE of Appearance by Nathaniel C. Donoghue on behalf of American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts (Donoghue, Nathaniel) (Entered: 11/01/2019)
2019-11-019ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Re-Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 11/01/2019)
2019-11-0110AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts. All Defendants. Acknowledgement filed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts. (Segal, Matthew) (Entered: 11/01/2019)
2019-11-0411AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to the Attorney General of the United States, Drug Enforcement Administration, and Federal Bureau of Investigation by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 11/04/2019)
2019-11-0412Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: Docket Entry 10 Service as to the United States corrected because: Counsel Segal filed the Service of the United States Under Wrong Event in CM/ECF. Summons/Affidavit Returned Executed as to the USA Re-Docketed Under the Correct Event (Docket Text Modified) as ECF No. 11 (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 11/04/2019)
2019-11-0413Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Brett Max Kaufman and Nathan Freed Wessler. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 11/04/2019)
2019-11-0414SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts. Federal Bureau of Investigation served on 11/4/2019, answer due 11/25/2019; UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 11/4/2019, answer due 11/25/2019; Drug Enforcement Administration served on 11/4/2019, answer due 11/25/2019., SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Attorney by American Civil Liberties Union; American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts. Federal Bureau of Investigation served on 11/4/2019, answer due 11/25/2019; UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 11/4/2019, answer due 11/25/2019; Drug Enforcement Administration served on 11/4/2019, answer due 11/25/2019. (Segal, Matthew) (Entered: 11/04/2019)
2019-11-0515SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Attorney by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts. Drug Enforcement Administration served on 11/4/2019, answer due 1/3/2020; Federal Bureau of Investigation served on 11/4/2019, answer due 1/3/2020; UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 11/4/2019, answer due 1/3/2020. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 11/05/2019)
2019-11-0516Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: Docket Entry 14 Summons Returned Executed as to the US Attorney Corrected Because: The Summons Was Filed Under the Wrong Event in CM/ECF by Counsel Segal. The Incorrect Answer Deadlines Were Terminated and the Summons Re-Docketed Under the Correct Event in CM/ECF as ECF No. 15 . (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 11/05/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar