Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleRyan LLC v. U.S. Department of the Interior
DistrictSouthern District of Texas
CityHouston
Case Number4:2019cv04305
Date Filed2019-11-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Charles Eskridge
PlaintiffRyan LLC
Case DescriptionThe law firm of Ryan LLC, specializing in tax services, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Interior for records concerning communications from the Office of Natural Resources relating to Ryan LLC from 2014 to the present. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Ryan LLC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Department of the Interior
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-11-011COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of the Interior (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23482838) filed by RYAN LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dumesnil, Bryan) (Entered: 11/01/2019)
2019-11-05Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of the Interior and U.S. Attorney. Issued summons returned to plaintiff in person, filed.(thanniable, 4) (Entered: 11/05/2019)
2019-11-062RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to U.S. Department of the Interior served on 11/5/2019, answer due 1/6/2020, filed.(Dumesnil, Bryan) (Entered: 11/06/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar