Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleInformed Consent Action Network v. United States Food and Drug Administration
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2019cv10235
Date Filed2019-11-04
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge John G. Koeltl
PlaintiffInformed Consent Action Network
Case DescriptionInformed Consent Network submitted a FOIA request to the FDA for records concerning clinical study reports for all clinical trials relied upon by the agency when it approved Varicella in 1995. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing from the agency, Informed Consent Network filed an administrative appeal. After hearing nothing more, Informed Consent Network filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Food and Drug Administration
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-11-041COMPLAINT against United States Food and Drug Administration. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17890803)Document filed by Informed Consent Action Network.(Siri, Aaron) (Entered: 11/04/2019)
2019-11-042CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Siri, Aaron) (Entered: 11/04/2019)
2019-11-043FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Food and Drug Administration, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Informed Consent Action Network. (Siri, Aaron) Modified on 11/5/2019 (pc). (Entered: 11/04/2019)
2019-11-05CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php . (pc) (Entered: 11/05/2019)
2019-11-05Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php . (pc) (Entered: 11/05/2019)
2019-11-05Case Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 11/05/2019)
2019-11-05***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Aaron Siri to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Attorney address field is blank;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc) (Entered: 11/05/2019)
2019-11-054REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Food and Drug Administration, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Informed Consent Action Network. (Siri, Aaron) (Entered: 11/05/2019)
2019-11-065ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Food and Drug Administration. (dnh) (Entered: 11/06/2019)
2019-12-06Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Initial Conference set for 2/3/2020 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 14A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge John G. Koeltl. (Fletcher, Donnie) (Entered: 12/06/2019)
2019-12-096AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Document filed by Informed Consent Action Network. (Siri, Aaron) (Entered: 12/09/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar