Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv03323
Date Filed2019-11-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionDemocracy Forward Foundation submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Housing and Urban, Development, the Department of Justice, and the U.S. Interagency Council on Homelessness for records concerning inter-agency communications and communications with third parties pertaining to the modification, postponement, or cancellation of the FY 2019 Specialized Housing and Services for Victims of Human Trafficking Notice of Funding Availability. DFF also requested a fee waiver. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests. HUD told DFF that it needed to identify which individuals to search. DFF told the agency that was not required under FOIA. After hearing nothing further from any of the agencies, DFF filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantU.S. INTERAGENCY COUNCIL ON HOMELESSNESS
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-11-051COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6506223) filed by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons, # 8 Summons, # 9 Summons)(Thurston, Robin) (Entered: 11/05/2019)
2019-11-052LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION (Thurston, Robin) (Entered: 11/05/2019)
2019-11-05Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zrdj) (Entered: 11/05/2019)
2019-11-053SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. INTERAGENCY COUNCIL ON HOMELESSNESS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj) (Entered: 11/05/2019)
2019-11-124STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 11/12/19. (Attachment: Exhibit 1) (mac) (Entered: 11/12/2019)
2019-11-195RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/12/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT served on 11/12/2019; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 11/12/2019; U.S. INTERAGENCY COUNCIL ON HOMELESSNESS served on 11/12/2019, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/12/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/12/2019.) (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Thurston, Robin) (Entered: 11/19/2019)
2019-12-116MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. INTERAGENCY COUNCIL ON HOMELESSNESS (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 12/11/2019)
2019-12-117NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Leeson Sroka on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. INTERAGENCY COUNCIL ON HOMELESSNESS (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 12/11/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar