Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY v. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv03348
Date Filed2019-11-06
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffPUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY
Case DescriptionPublic Employees for Ethical Responsibility submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Land Management for records concerning communications pertaining to William Perry Pendley, who had been nominated as the agency's deputy director for policy and management, including how and why he was appointed. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, PEER filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantBUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-11-061COMPLAINT against BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6511767) filed by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet cover sheet, # 2 Declaration Local Rule Declaration, # 3 Summons Attorney General Summons, # 4 Summons Agency Summons, # 5 Summons USAO summons)(Jenkins, Peter) (Entered: 11/06/2019)
2019-11-07Case assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zmc) (Entered: 11/07/2019)
2019-11-082SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 11/08/2019)
2019-12-053NOTICE of Appearance by Marina Utgoff Braswell on behalf of BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 12/05/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar