Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFOOD & WATER WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv03362
Date Filed2019-11-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffFOOD & WATER WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionFood & Water Watch submitted four FOIA requests to the Food Safety and Inspection Service for records concerning the agency's new inspection system for market hogs. FWW also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of FWW's multi-part requests. The agency asked FWW to clarify some items. The agency was able to respond to some items, but all of them. After the agency failed to respond substantively to its requests, FWW filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE
DefendantFOOD SAFETY AND INSPECTION SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-11-071COMPLAINT against FOOD SAFETY AND INSPECTION SERVICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6514693) filed by FOOD & WATER WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover sheet, # 2 Summons Summons USDA, # 3 Summons Summons FSIS, # 4 Summons Summons USAG, # 5 Summons Summons USAO)(Corrigan, Zachary) (Entered: 11/07/2019)
2019-11-072LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests (and LCR 7.1 certificate) by FOOD & WATER WATCH, INC. (Corrigan, Zachary) (Entered: 11/07/2019)
2019-11-08Case assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zmc) (Entered: 11/08/2019)
2019-11-083SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to FOOD SAFETY AND INSPECTION SERVICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Main Document 3 replaced to correct missing signature on 11/12/2019) (zmc). (Entered: 11/08/2019)
2019-11-254RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FOOD SAFETY AND INSPECTION SERVICE served on 11/20/2019 (Corrigan, Zachary) (Entered: 11/25/2019)
2019-11-255RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/18/19. (Corrigan, Zachary) (Entered: 11/25/2019)
2019-11-256RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/19/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/19/2019. (Corrigan, Zachary) (Entered: 11/25/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar