Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION v. CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv03370
Date Filed2019-11-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionDemocracy Forward Foundation submitted two FOIA requests to the Consumer Financial Protection Bureau for records concerning coordination between CFPB and the Department of Education for providing assistance on student loans. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, DFF filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantCONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-11-071COMPLAINT against CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number BDCDC-6518380) filed by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit)(Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 11/07/2019)
2019-11-072LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION (Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 11/07/2019)
2019-11-08Case assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zmc) (Entered: 11/08/2019)
2019-11-083SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 11/08/2019)
2019-11-184RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU served on 11/13/2019, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/14/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/14/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/14/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 11/18/2019)
2019-12-065NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Karianne Melissa Jones on behalf of DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION Substituting for attorney Javier M. Guzman (Jones, Karianne) (Entered: 12/06/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar