Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePROJECT ON GOVERNMENT OVERSIGHT v. U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv03372
Date Filed2019-11-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffPROJECT ON GOVERNMENT OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionProject on Government Oversight submitted eight FOIA requests to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records on a variety of issues. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after the agency failed to respond to any of the requests, POGO filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
Complaint attachment 17
Complaint attachment 18
Complaint attachment 19
Complaint attachment 20
Complaint attachment 21
Complaint attachment 22
Complaint attachment 23
Complaint attachment 24
Complaint attachment 25
Complaint attachment 26
Complaint attachment 27
Complaint attachment 28
Complaint attachment 29
Complaint attachment 30
Complaint attachment 31
Complaint attachment 32
Complaint attachment 33
Complaint attachment 34
Complaint attachment 35
Complaint attachment 36
Complaint attachment 37
Complaint attachment 38
Complaint attachment 39
Complaint attachment 40
Complaint attachment 41
Complaint attachment 42
Complaint attachment 43
Complaint attachment 44
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-11-071COMPLAINT against U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6519722) filed by PROJECT ON GOVERNMENT OVERSIGHT (POGO). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Y, # 26 Exhibit Z, # 27 Exhibit AA, # 28 Exhibit BB, # 29 Exhibit CC, # 30 Exhibit DD, # 31 Exhibit EE, # 32 Exhibit FF, # 33 Exhibit GG, # 34 Exhibit HH, # 35 Exhibit II, # 36 Exhibit JJ, # 37 Exhibit KK, # 38 Exhibit LL, # 39 Exhibit MM, # 40 Exhibit NN, # 41 Civil Cover Sheet, # 42 Summons ICE, # 43 Summons USAG, # 44 Summons USAO)(Nabatoff, Ross) (Entered: 11/07/2019)
2019-11-12Case assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zmc) (Entered: 11/12/2019)
2019-11-122SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 11/12/2019)
2019-12-123RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/18/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/18/2019. (Nabatoff, Ross) (Entered: 12/12/2019)
2019-12-124RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/18/19. (Nabatoff, Ross) (Entered: 12/12/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar