Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleRocky Mountain Wild, Inc v. Bureau of Land Management et al
DistrictDistrict of Colorado
CityDenver
Case Number1:2019cv03171
Date Filed2019-11-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix
PlaintiffRocky Mountain Wild, INC a Colorado non-profit corporation
Case DescriptionRocky Mountain Wild submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Land Management for records concerning the Tres Rios Field Office Area of Critical Environmental Concern amendment to the TRFO Resource Management Plan. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing further, RMW filed suit, alleging a pattern or practice by the agency of failing to respond to its requests within the statutory time limit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Bureau of Land Management a federal agency
DefendantBureau of Land Management a federal agency
DefendantDepartment of Interior a federal agency
DefendantUnited States Department of Interior a federal agency
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-11-071COMPLAINT against Bureau of Land Management, Department of Interior (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6986646)Attorney Matthew David Sandler added to party Rocky Mountain Wild(pty:pla), filed by Rocky Mountain Wild. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit May 15, 2019 FOIA Request, # 2 Exhibit August 19, 2019 Response Letter, # 3 Exhibit October 15, 2019 Response Letter, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Summons Summons BLM, # 6 Summons Summons DOI, # 7 Summons Summons USAG, # 8 Summons Summons USAO)(Sandler, Matthew) (Entered: 11/07/2019)
2019-11-072Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (alave, ) (Entered: 11/08/2019)
2019-11-073SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (alave, ) (Entered: 11/08/2019)
2019-11-124MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Judge Robert E. Blackburn. This case israndomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix for all further proceedings. This case is randomly reassigned to 19-cv-03171-KLM . (sphil, ) (Entered: 11/12/2019)
2019-12-055NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kyle W. Brenton on behalf of United States Department of Interior, United States Bureau of Land ManagementAttorney Kyle W. Brenton added to party United States Department of Interior (pty:dft), Attorney Kyle W. Brenton added to party United States Bureau of Land Management(pty:dft) (Brenton, Kyle) (Entered: 12/05/2019)
2019-12-126Partial MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants United States Department of Interior, United States Bureau of Land Management. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Installment 3, # 2 Exhibit B - Final Response, # 3 Exhibit C - Protet Letter)(Brenton, Kyle) (Entered: 12/12/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar